Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Auguste-François-Eutrope Eyssautier

Deceased

Bishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1844BornEntrevaux
6 Jun 186823.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 190661.9AppointedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
30 Nov 190662.0Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
7 Mar 192378.2DiedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Auguste-François-Eutrope Eyssautier:
Bishop Jean-Auguste-François-Eutrope Eyssautier (born , died ) Bishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015