Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas de Castro (Laino), C.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

Titular Bishop of Fussala


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1675AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
30 Aug 1675AppointedTitular Bishop of Fussala
15 Sep 1675Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fussala
16 Jul 1685DiedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas de Castro (Laino):
Bishop Thomas de Castro (Laino) C.R. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 206
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,485
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013