Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raphael de Figueredo

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

Titular Bishop of Hadrumetum


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Mar 1677AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
3 Mar 1677AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
14 Sep 1681Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
16 Jul 1685SucceededVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
12 Oct 1695DiedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India

MicroData Summary for Raphael de Figueredo:
Bishop Raphael de Figueredo (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 216
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015