Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Karikkassery

Bishop of Kottapuram


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1946 BornKarthedom
19 Dec 197327.8Ordained PriestPriest of Verapoly, India
25 Nov 200660.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Verapoly, India
25 Nov 200660.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Buxentum
28 Dec 200660.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buxentum
18 Dec 201064.8AppointedBishop of Kottapuram, India
13 Feb 201165.0InstalledBishop of Kottapuram, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Karikkassery:
Bishop Joseph Karikkassery (born ) Bishop of Kottapuram

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kottapuram.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,302
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013