Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Custodio do Pinho

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria

Vicar Apostolic of Idalcan / Deccan / Bijapur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1638BornSalsete, Portugal
14 Jan 166930.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Idalcan / Deccan / Bijapur, India
14 Jan 166930.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
27 Jan 166930.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
16 Jan 169455.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
1696²57.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India
14 Apr 169758.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Custodio do Pinho:
Bishop Custodio do Pinho (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

  • a bishop for 28.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,057
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 9 Apr 2015