Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giuseppe Antonio Albertini, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Malabar, India

Titular See: (Giovanni Maria di San Tommaso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1726Born
15 Aug 174619.8ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
23 Dec 178054.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
23 Dec 178054.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Albertini
Father Giuseppe Antonio Albertini O.C.D. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Malabar

EventPlace
Birth PlacePavia, Diocese of Pavia, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,781
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 153, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast