Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Antonio Bartolomeo Marcellino Berardi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Verapoly, India

Titular Bishop of Paros

Titular See: (de Santa Teresa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1829Born
15 Oct 184617.0ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
17 Aug 187747.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Verapoly, India
17 Aug 187747.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Paros
21 Oct 187748.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paros
21 Mar 189262.4DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Verapoly, India

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Antonio Bartolomeo Marcellino Berardi
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Antonio Bartolomeo Marcellino Berardi O.C.D. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Verapoly

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCosta Rainero, Diocese of Albenga, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Verapoly, Vicariate Apostolic of Verapoly

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 441
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,394
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018