Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo of St. Theresa (Giuseppe) Baccinelli, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Verapoly

Titular Archbishop of Pharsalus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1807BornRoma, Italy
8 Dec 182417.7ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
26 Jan 184739.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Heraclea Pontica
23 May 184740.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heraclea Pontica
24 May 185952.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
24 May 185952.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Verapoly, India
5 Sep 186861.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Verapoly, India

MicroData Summary for Bernardo of St. Theresa (Giuseppe) Baccinelli (VIAF: 40804293)
Archbishop Bernardo of St. Theresa (Giuseppe) Baccinelli O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Verapoly

  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 303, and Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Dec 2016