Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo (Philip) Pontanova, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tanis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1804BornNapoli
21 Jan 182823.6ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
6 May 184540.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
5 Oct 184541.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
13 Mar 185348.7DiedTitular Bishop of Tanis

MicroData Summary for Bernardo (Philip) Pontanova:
Bishop Bernardo (Philip) Pontanova O.C.D. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tanis

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013