Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Saverio (di Sant’Anna) Pescetto, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Verapoly, India

Titular Archbishop of Sardes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1771Born
23 May 179019.0ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
8 Mar 183159.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Verapoly, India
8 Mar 183159.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
4 Dec 183160.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
184068.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Verapoly, India
10 Apr 184068.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
7 Dec 184473.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Sardes

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio (di Sant’Anna) Pescetto
Archbishop Francesco Saverio (di Sant’Anna) Pescetto O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Verapoly

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCelle, Italy

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 70, and Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017