Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchior-Marie-Joseph de Marion-Brésillac, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Sierra Leone

Titular Bishop of Prusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1813BornCastelnaudary, France
22 Dec 183825.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
6 May 184531.4AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Coimbatore, India
6 May 184531.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Prusa
4 Oct 184632.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Prusa
3 Apr 185036.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Coimbatore, India
18 Mar 185541.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Coimbatore, India
13 Apr 185844.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sierra Leone
25 Jun 185945.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for Melchior-Marie-Joseph de Marion-Brésillac:
Bishop Melchior-Marie-Joseph de Marion-Brésillac M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Sierra Leone

  • a priest for 20.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013