Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Vigliotti, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Malabar, India

Titular Bishop of Metellopolis

Titular See: (François de Sainte-Thérèse)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1650Born
20 Feb 170049.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
20 Feb 170049.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
22 May 170251.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
16 Oct 171262.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India

MicroData Summary for Angelo Vigliotti
Bishop Angelo Vigliotti O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondovi, Diocese of Mondovi, Italy
Ordained BishopMangate
Death PlaceVerapoly

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 266
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,969

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Aug 2020

Quantcast