Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Antonio Vareschi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

Titular Bishop of Calama

Titular See: (Carlo di San Corrado)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1725BornPanchia
12 Jun 174722.3ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
14 Sep 176439.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
15 Sep 176439.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
15 May 177348.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India
20 Jun 177348.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
6 Jan 178559.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Antonio Vareschi:
Bishop Giorgio Antonio Vareschi O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 139, and Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015