Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Maria Multedi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

Titular Bishop of Limyra

Titular See: (di Santa Teresa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1673BornAlessio
1 Feb 171440.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
1 Feb 171440.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
4 Apr 171743.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limyra
6 Apr 175076.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Maria Multedi:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Maria Multedi O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 244
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015