Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Kaithathara

Bishop of Gwalior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1939 BornGothuruthy
21 Dec 196324.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Feb 199959.6AppointedBishop of Gwalior, India
1 May 199959.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gwalior, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kaithathara:
Bishop Joseph Kaithathara (born ) Bishop of Gwalior

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gwalior.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,505

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013