Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick D’Souza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jhansi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1934BornSiddakatte
1 Jan 196126.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 197742.2AppointedBishop of Jhansi, India
25 Apr 197742.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jhansi, India
31 Oct 201277.9RetiredBishop of Jhansi, India
12 Jul 201681.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Jhansi, India

MicroData Summary for Frederick D’Souza
Bishop Frederick D’Souza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jhansi

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2012
  • d: CB, 13 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jul 2016