Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Parapullil

Bishop of Jhansi, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1949 Born
29 Feb 197626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Jhansi, India
31 Oct 201262.9AppointedBishop of Jhansi, India
6 Jan 201363.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jhansi, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Parapullil
Bishop Peter Parapullil (born ) Bishop of Jhansi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerumanoor

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jhansi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2012
  • ob: CB, 7 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 9 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,643

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018