Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustach Federl, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

Titular Bishop of Germanicia

Titular See: (Franz Sales von der schmerzhaften Mutter)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1732BornMunich, Germany
9 Apr 175320.5ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
27 Jul 177441.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
27 Jul 177441.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicia
20 Nov 177442.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicia
23 Aug 177946.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
26 Jul 178754.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Malabar, India

MicroData Summary for Eustach Federl:
Bishop Eustach Federl O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 224, and Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015