Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Szostak, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

Titular Bishop of Areopolis

Titular See: (Florencjusz od Jezusa Nazareńskiego)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1710¹BornVilnius, Lithuania
12 Oct 172818.8ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
19 Jan 174636.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
19 Jan 174636.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Areopolis
6 Apr 175040.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
22 Apr 175141.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Areopolis
26 Jul 177363.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Szostak:
Bishop Mikołaj Szostak O.C.D. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Malabar

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 97, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013