Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Thannikot

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Verapoly, India

Titular Bishop of Tigillava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1937Born
14 Mar 196427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Verapoly, India
19 Dec 197841.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Verapoly, India
19 Dec 197841.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigillava
11 Mar 197942.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigillava
24 Feb 198446.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Verapoly, India

MicroData Summary for Anthony Thannikot
Bishop Anthony Thannikot (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Verapoly

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoonemmave
Ordained BishopGrounds of, S. Albert High School, Ernakulam

  • a priest for 19.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,727

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast