Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marianus Arokiasamy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Madurai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1927BornPudur Uthamanur
7 Dec 195427.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 197043.2AppointedBishop of Kottar, India
17 Feb 197143.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kottar, India
3 Jul 198759.8AppointedArchbishop of Madurai, India
22 Mar 200375.6RetiredArchbishop of Madurai, India
22 Mar 200779.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Madurai, India

MicroData Summary for Marianus Arokiasamy:
Archbishop Marianus Arokiasamy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madurai

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013