Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Royappan Antony Muthu

Deceased

Bishop of Vellore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1912Born
28 Mar 193623.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 197058.6AppointedBishop of Vellore, India
21 Apr 197159.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vellore, India
19 Dec 198068.6DiedBishop of Vellore, India

MicroData Summary for Royappan Antony Muthu
Bishop Royappan Antony Muthu (born , died ) Bishop of Vellore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVellicode
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Vellore, Diocese of Vellore

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 803
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,343
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast