Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Fernando

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1913BornIdinthakarai
18 Mar 193925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Tuticorin, India
25 Jun 195037.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tuticorin, India
25 Jun 195037.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Abitinae
1 Oct 195037.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abitinae
26 Jun 195340.1SucceededBishop of Tuticorin, India
23 Nov 197057.5AppointedBishop of Tiruchirapalli, India
6 Oct 199077.4RetiredBishop of Tiruchirapalli, India
4 Jul 200693.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Fernando:
Bishop Thomas Fernando (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 55.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • c4: CB, 15 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1950, Number 81
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013