Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Tiburtius Roche, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tuticorin

Titular Bishop of Amadassa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1879BornTuticorin
2 Oct 191031.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Jun 192344.2AppointedBishop of Tuticorin, India
23 Sep 192344.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tuticorin, India
26 Jun 195374.2ResignedBishop of Tuticorin, India
26 Jul 195374.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amadassa
17 Dec 195576.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tuticorin, India

MicroData Summary for Francis Tiburtius Roche:
Bishop Francis Tiburtius Roche S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tuticorin

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1923, Number 54
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013