Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ange-Auguste Faisandier, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trichinopoly

Titular Bishop of Elatea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1853BornCoubon, France
30 Mar 190955.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trichinopoly, India
30 Mar 190955.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dodona
27 Jun 190955.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dodona
19 Dec 191360.4SucceededBishop of Trichinopoly, India
24 Sep 193481.2RetiredBishop of Trichinopoly, India
24 Sep 193481.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Elatea
25 May 193581.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Trichinopoly, India

MicroData Summary for Ange-Auguste Faisandier:
Bishop Ange-Auguste Faisandier S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trichinopoly

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015