Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrose Mathalaimuthu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coimbatore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1925BornNagalur
21 Dec 195126.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 197146.1AppointedBishop of Tuticorin, India
9 Dec 197146.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tuticorin, India
6 Dec 197954.4AppointedBishop of Coimbatore, India
10 Jul 200277.0RetiredBishop of Coimbatore, India
15 Nov 200984.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Coimbatore, India

MicroData Summary for Ambrose Mathalaimuthu:
Bishop Ambrose Mathalaimuthu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coimbatore

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013