Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Aquinas Lephonse

Bishop of Coimbatore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1953 Born
22 May 198027.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vellore, India
10 Jul 200249.3AppointedBishop of Coimbatore, India
28 Aug 200249.4Ordained BishopBishop of Coimbatore, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Aquinas Lephonse
Bishop Thomas Aquinas Lephonse (born ) Bishop of Coimbatore

EventPlace
Birth PlacePillaithope

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Coimbatore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018