Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Justin Diraviam

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Madurai, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1907Born
6 Apr 193527.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 196760.0AppointedArchbishop of Madurai, India
9 Jul 196760.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Madurai, India
3 Dec 198477.6RetiredArchbishop of Madurai, India
25 Jan 199183.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Madurai, India

MicroData Summary for Justin Diraviam
Archbishop Justin Diraviam (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madurai

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalakurichi

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017