Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Savarinathen Iruthayaraj

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palayamkottai, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1927Born
20 Dec 195932.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 197345.8AppointedBishop of Palayamkottai, India
12 Sep 197346.1Ordained BishopBishop of Palayamkottai, India
15 Jul 199972.0ResignedBishop of Palayamkottai, India
18 Oct 200174.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Palayamkottai, India

MicroData Summary for Savarinathen Iruthayaraj
Bishop Savarinathen Iruthayaraj (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palayamkottai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUdhagamandalam
Ordained BishopSt. Xavier High School, Palayamkottai, Diocese of Palayamkottai

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast