Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Packiam Arokiaswamy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tanjore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1921BornKombeikadu
12 Dec 194625.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 197149.9AppointedBishop of Ootacamund, India
28 Apr 197150.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ootacamund, India
6 Dec 197150.8AppointedArchbishop of Bangalore, India
12 Sep 198665.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tanjore, India
28 Jun 199776.4RetiredBishop of Tanjore, India
22 May 200382.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tanjore, India

MicroData Summary for Packiam Arokiaswamy:
Archbishop Packiam Arokiaswamy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tanjore

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013