Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Masilamony Arul Das

Deceased

Archbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1930Born
20 Dec 195525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ootacamund, India
21 Dec 197343.9AppointedBishop of Ootacamund, India
20 Feb 197444.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ootacamund, India
11 May 199464.3AppointedArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
30 Aug 200474.6DiedArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India

MicroData Summary for James Masilamony Arul Das
Archbishop James Masilamony Arul Das (born , died ) Archbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUdhagamandalam
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Church, Ootacamund, Diocese of Ootacamund

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • obc2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast