Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antony Devotta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1943Born
27 Aug 197128.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 200057.3AppointedBishop of Tiruchirapalli, India
28 Jan 200157.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tiruchirapalli, India
14 Jul 201875.0RetiredBishop of Tiruchirapalli, India
15 Oct 201976.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli, India

MicroData Summary for Antony Devotta
Bishop Antony Devotta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Thome
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Campion School, Tiruchirapalli, Diocese of Tiruchirapalli
Death PlaceSt. Augustine Minor, Seminary, Tiruchirapalli, Diocese of Tiruchirapalli
Buried Place (Original)Donated to Science

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,892
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2018
  • d: CB, 15 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 26 Oct 2019

Quantcast