Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jebalamai Susaimanickam

Bishop of Sivagangai, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1945 Born
27 Jan 197125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Madurai, India
1 Apr 200559.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sivagangai, India
15 May 200559.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Sivagangai, India
1 Sep 200559.9SucceededBishop of Sivagangai, India

MicroData Summary for Jebalamai Susaimanickam
Bishop Jebalamai Susaimanickam (born ) Bishop of Sivagangai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaruthakanmoi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sivagangai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,890

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018