Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonysamy Savarimuthu

Bishop of Palayamkottai, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1960 Born
26 Apr 198726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Palayamkottai, India
20 Nov 201958.9AppointedBishop of Palayamkottai, India
15 Dec 201959.0Ordained BishopBishop of Palayamkottai, India

MicroData Summary for Antonysamy Savarimuthu
Bishop Antonysamy Savarimuthu (born ) Bishop of Palayamkottai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVadakku Vandaman, Diocese of Palayamkottai
Ordained BishopGrounds, St Xavier’s Higher Secondary School, Palayamkottai, Diocese of Palayamkottai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palayamkottai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2019
  • ob: CB, 22 Nov 2019
  • c2+: CB, 10 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast