Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Fernando

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Madurai, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1939Born
31 May 197132.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tuticorin, India
23 Feb 199656.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tuticorin, India
29 May 199657.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Tuticorin, India
8 Dec 199960.7SucceededBishop of Tuticorin, India
22 Mar 200364.0AppointedArchbishop of Madurai, India
26 Jul 201475.3RetiredArchbishop of Madurai, India
31 Dec 201677.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Madurai, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Fernando
Archbishop Peter Fernando (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madurai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIdinthakarai

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,906
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2014
  • d: CB, 31 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 31 Dec 2016