Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Anthony Irudayaraj, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dharmapuri, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1935Born
20 Apr 196529.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Jan 199761.3AppointedBishop of Dharmapuri, India
24 Apr 199761.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dharmapuri, India
13 Jan 201276.2RetiredBishop of Dharmapuri, India
29 Nov 201984.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Dharmapuri, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anthony Irudayaraj
Bishop Joseph Anthony Irudayaraj S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dharmapuri

EventPlace
Birth PlacePursawalkam
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Grounds of, Infant Jesus, Cathedral, Salem, Diocese of Salem
Death PlaceChennai
Buried Place (Original)New Catheral Site, Diocese of Dharmapuri

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,995
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 29 Nov 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast