Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Lawrence Sengol

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1928BornMandalakottai
17 Apr 195526.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 199062.0AppointedBishop of Tiruchirapalli, India
30 Dec 199062.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tiruchirapalli, India
14 Oct 199769.0ResignedBishop of Tiruchirapalli, India
29 Jan 201283.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli, India

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Lawrence Sengol:
Bishop Gabriel Lawrence Sengol (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tiruchirapalli

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,388
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015