Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Casimir Gnanadickam, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1925Born
28 Jul 195732.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Aug 196035.3Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Dec 198459.6AppointedArchbishop of Madurai, India
16 Jun 198560.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Madurai, India
26 Jan 198761.7AppointedArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
10 Nov 199368.5DiedArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India

MicroData Summary for Casimir Gnanadickam
Archbishop Casimir Gnanadickam S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSuranam

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018