Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony Rayappa Arulappa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1912Born
19 Mar 193825.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 196653.3AppointedArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
25 Mar 196653.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
26 Jan 198774.3RetiredArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
2 Aug 199683.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India

MicroData Summary for Anthony Rayappa Arulappa
Archbishop Anthony Rayappa Arulappa (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDharkast

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast