Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Remigius

Bishop of Kottar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1939 BornManakudy-Mel
18 Apr 196626.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 198950.4AppointedBishop of Kumbakonam, India
3 Jan 199050.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kumbakonam, India
30 Jun 200768.1AppointedBishop of Kottar, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Remigius:
Bishop Peter Remigius (born ) Bishop of Kottar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kottar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,058
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015