Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Venmani S. Selvanather

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1913BornTiruchengode
26 Oct 194128.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salem, India
3 Mar 194935.7AppointedBishop of Salem, India
1 May 194935.8Ordained BishopBishop of Salem, India
17 Mar 197359.7AppointedArchbishop of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
18 Feb 199278.6RetiredArchbishop of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
14 Oct 199380.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India

MicroData Summary for Venmani S. Selvanather:
Archbishop Venmani S. Selvanather (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013