Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Bosco Duraisamy

Deceased

Bishop of Salem, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1929Born
17 Dec 195526.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 197444.8AppointedBishop of Salem, India
10 Jun 197445.1Ordained BishopBishop of Salem, India
9 Jun 199970.1DiedBishop of Salem, India

MicroData Summary for Michael Bosco Duraisamy
Bishop Michael Bosco Duraisamy (born , died ) Bishop of Salem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGingee

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018