Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Francis Rayappa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kumbakonam, India

Titular Bishop of Arabissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1882Born
23 Dec 191129.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 193148.5AppointedBishop of Kumbakonam, India
29 Jun 193148.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kumbakonam, India
20 Sep 195472.1ResignedBishop of Kumbakonam, India
20 Sep 195472.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Arabissus
27 Apr 197390.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Kumbakonam, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Francis Rayappa
Bishop Peter Francis Rayappa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kumbakonam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKottaipalayam

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1974
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast