Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oubagaraswami Bernadotte

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbatore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1899BornRettiarpalayam
23 May 192526.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 194041.2AppointedBishop of Coimbatore, India
25 Jul 194041.5Ordained BishopBishop of Coimbatore, India
5 Feb 194950.0DiedBishop of Coimbatore, India

MicroData Summary for Oubagaraswami Bernadotte:
Bishop Oubagaraswami Bernadotte (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbatore

  • a priest for 23.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1950
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013