Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nazarene Soosai

Bishop of Kottar, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1963 Born
2 Apr 198925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kottar, India
20 May 201754.1AppointedBishop of Kottar, India
29 Jun 201754.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kottar, India

MicroData Summary
Nazarene Soosai
Bishop Nazarene Soosai
(born )
Bishop of Kottar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRajakkalamngalamthurai, Diocese of Kottar
Ordained BishopBishop's House Campus, Nagercoil, Diocese of Kottar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kottar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 20 May 2017
  • c2+: CB, 21 Jun 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 11 May 2025