Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonysamy Francis

Bishop of Kumbakonam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1946 BornIluppur
2 Aug 197428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tanjore, India
31 May 200862.1AppointedBishop of Kumbakonam, India
9 Jul 200862.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kumbakonam, India

MicroData Summary for Antonysamy Francis:
Bishop Antonysamy Francis (born ) Bishop of Kumbakonam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kumbakonam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,929

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013