Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Rajendran Kuttinadar, S.D.B.

Bishop of Thuckalay (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1968 BornPadanthalumoodu
1994²25.7ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Dec 200335.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Aug 201244.4AppointedBishop of Thuckalay (Syro-Malabarese), India
16 Sep 201244.4Ordained BishopBishop of Thuckalay (Syro-Malabarese), India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Rajendran Kuttinadar:
Bishop George Rajendran Kuttinadar S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Thuckalay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Thuckalay (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2012
  • ob: CB, 25 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,542

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013