Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Perumthotttam

Archbishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1948 BornPunnathura
18 Dec 197426.5Ordained PriestPriest of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India
24 Apr 200253.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India
24 Apr 200253.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia
20 May 200253.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia
22 Jan 200758.5AppointedArchbishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Perumthotttam:
Archbishop Joseph Perumthotttam (born ) Archbishop of Changanacherry

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013