Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Athikalam, M.S.T.

Bishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India

Note/Previous Titular See: (Missionary Society of St. Thomas the Apostle)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1958 Born
22 Mar 198425.7Ordained PriestPriest of Other
12 Jan 201859.5AppointedBishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India
17 Apr 201859.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for James Athikalam
Bishop James Athikalam M.S.T. (born ) Bishop of Sagar

EventPlace
Birth PlacePulinkunnu, Archeparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
Ordained BishopSt. Theresa, Cathedral, Sagar, Diocese of Sagar (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sagar (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2018
  • ob: CB, 19 Jan 2018
  • c2+: CB, 5 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,763

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 May 2020

Quantcast