Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Valiamattam

Archbishop Emeritus of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1938 Born
30 Nov 196325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India
18 Feb 198950.4AppointedBishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India
1 May 198950.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India
18 May 199556.6AppointedArchbishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India
29 Aug 201475.9RetiredArchbishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for George Valiamattam
Archbishop George Valiamattam (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tellicherry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKodencherry
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Tellicherry, Eparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,272
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2014
  • c1: CB, 5 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast